VA HB586 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Community energy programs. Authorizes investor-owned electric utilities and electric cooperatives to establish a community energy program with a community subscriber organization. Under a community energy program, community subscribers and community subscriber organizations may participate in community net energy metering with mutually agreed-upon community subscriber payment rates and community subscriber credit rates. A community subscriber (i) acquires a subscription that entitles him to a proportional interest in a renewable energy generation facility and (ii) receives a credit on his electric utility bill based on the community subscriber credit rate multiplied by his share of the facility's output.
Title
Community energy programs; investor-owned electric utilities & electric cooperatives to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102621D |