VA HB586 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Continued to 2013 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - House: Continued to 2013 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Corrections; confinement of local inmates in state correctional facilities. Allows sheriffs and regional jail administrators to sign agreements with the Department of Corrections for the housing of local inmates in state prisons.
Title
Corrections, Department of; confinement of local inmates in state correctional facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | House: Continued to 2013 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100319D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB586 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB586+hil |