VA HB585 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 25, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Comprehensive plan; transit-oriented development. Requires that each city with a population greater than 20,000 and each county with a population greater than 100,000 consider incorporating into the next scheduled and all subsequent reviews of its comprehensive plan strategies to promote transit-oriented development for the purpose of reducing greenhouse gas emissions through coordinated transportation, housing, and land use planning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive plan; certain localities to promote transit-oriented development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 25, 2020
2020-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2020
2020-02-17SenateSigned by President
2020-02-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB585ER)
2020-02-17HouseEnrolled
2020-02-14HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-14HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N)
2020-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-12SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-12SenateRead third time
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2020-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 20104350D-E
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB585E
2020-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-28HouseRead first time
2020-01-24HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104350D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522223.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB585
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB585+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB585E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB585ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0702V0002+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0009+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0214+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0066+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0519HB0585+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0641HB0585+HB0585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0948+HB0585

Bill Comments

feedback