VA HB581 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; required online training for diversity and cultural competency. Requires the Department of Human Resource Management to develop an online diversity and cultural competency training module. The bill requires all state employees commencing or recommencing employment with the Commonwealth on or after January 1, 2021, to complete such training within 90 days of commencing or recommencing such employment and all persons employed with the Commonwealth on January 1, 2021, to complete such training no later than April 1, 2021.
Title
Diversity and cultural competency; DHRM to develop online training module.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB581ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108909D-S1 (52-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB581S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108909D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108909D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101109D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |