VA HB580 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse and neglect; gender identity or sexual orientation. Expands the definition of "abused or neglected child" to include any child whose parents, or other person responsible for his care, create or inflict, threaten to create or inflict, or allow to be created or inflicted upon such child a physical or mental injury on the basis of the child's gender identity or sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse and neglect; gender identity or sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102121D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback