VA HB58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Light-emitting diode (LED) use on outdoor lighting fixtures. Requires any state agency that installs, replaces, or maintains an outdoor lighting fixture to use LEDs instead of traditional incandescent light bulbs when installing new outdoor lighting fixtures or replacing nonfunctioning bulbs on existing outdoor lighting fixtures unless the appropriate agency authority determines it is not cost efficient to do so. The bill creates an exception to these requirements for the installation or replacement of light bulbs on state-owned property that is listed individually on the Virginia Landmarks Register or is certified by the Director of the Virginia Department of Historic Resources as contributing to the historic significance of a historic district that is listed on the Virginia Landmarks Register. The bill also provides for the Department of General Services to include the requirement for the use of LEDs in the agency's purchasing regulations. Contracts entered into by the Department of Transportation on and after July 1, 2019, are subject to the requirement.
Title
State agencies; use of light-emitting diodes (LEDs) on outdoor lighting fixtures.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (16-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101285D |