VA HB58 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wireless telecommunications devices in motor vehicles. Extends prohibition on use of wireless telecommunications devices in motor vehicles to talking on such device, unless the device is configured for hands-free operation and is being used in the hands-free mode.
Title
Wireless telecommunications devices; prohibits talking on such device unless in hands-free mode.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2009-12-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2009-12-28 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101650D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB58 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB58+hil |