VA HB57 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Student attendance; withdrawal of students absent without excuse. Requires a public elementary orsecondary school student to be dropped from the roll and marked as "withdrawn" if he has been absent without excuse for 15 consecutive school days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student attendance; withdrawal of students absent without excuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-16HouseLeft in Education
2016-02-15HouseRereferred to Education
2016-02-15HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2016-02-15HouseRead second time
2016-02-15HousePassed by temporarily
2016-02-12HousePassed by for the day
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104500D-H1
2016-02-10HouseReported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2016-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2016-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2015-12-02HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2015-12-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101107D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221254(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback