VA HB565 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund. Creates the Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund to support the General Assembly's long-term goal of supporting efforts to increase the number of new eligible credentials in advanced manufacturing. The bill provides that moneys in the Fund shall also be used to improve the readiness of graduates to be employed in advanced manufacturing fields and fields that align with advanced manufacturing growth opportunities identified by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership.
Title
Advanced Manufacturing Talent Investment Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Jason Ballard [R] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] |
Del. William Wampler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB565ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-12 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 4-N) |
2022-03-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Locke, Pillion |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Ballard, Rasoul |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107361D-S1 (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB565S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107361D-S1 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107361D-S1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102051D |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
SB685 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
SB685 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)