VA HB565 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Three-year moratorium on installation of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires at schools and recreational parks. Places a three-year moratorium on the installation of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires within the boundaries of a public or private elementary or secondary school, public or private preschool, or recreational park by any (i) public or private elementary or secondary school, (ii) public or private preschool, or (iii) local governing body. The bill also requires the Virginia Department of Health, in coordination with the Virginia Department of Conservation and Recreation and the Virginia Department of Education, to analyze the potential adverse health effects of synthetic turf that contains recycled crumb rubber from waste tires and report its findings to the General Assembly no later than July 1, 2019.
Title
Synthetic turf; 3-year moratorium on installation of turf that contains recycled crumb rubber.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100899D |