VA HB564 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Hunting apparel; hunting from enclosed ground blind; solid blaze orange or solid blaze pink. Allows a hunter hunting from an enclosed ground blind during any firearms deer season, except during the special season for hunting deer with a muzzle-loading rifle only, to display attached to or immediately above the blind at least 100 square inches of solid blaze orange or solid blaze pink material visible from 360 degrees in lieu of wearing specified hunting apparel. The bill also requires that all specified blaze orange or blaze pink hunting apparel or material be solid in color and safety or fluorescent in hue. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting apparel; hunting from an enclosed blind, displaying solid blaze orange or solid blaze pink.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
2018-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB564ER)
2018-02-22HouseEnrolled
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateRead third time
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
2018-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
2018-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 18101520D-E
2018-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB564E
2018-01-29HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-01-29HouseRead second time
2018-01-26HouseRead first time
2018-01-24HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101520D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291530.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB564
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB564+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB564E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB564ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0151+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0102V0006+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0012+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0016+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0139+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0075+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB0564+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0571HB0564+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0581HB0564+HB0564
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0582HB0564+HB0564

Bill Comments

feedback