VA HB563 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Equipment used to determine the decibel level of sound. Authorizes a law-enforcement officer to use certain equipment to determine the decibel level of sound, including noise. The results of such determinations shall be accepted as prima facie evidence of the decibel level of the sound in any court or legal proceeding where the decibel level of the sound is at issue. The bill also provides that in any court or legal proceeding in which any question arises about the calibration or accuracy of such equipment used to determine the decibel level of sound, a certificate, or a true copy thereof, showing the calibration or testing for accuracy of the equipment, and when and by whom the calibration or test was made, shall be admissible as evidence of the facts therein stated.
Title
Decibel level of sound; authorizes a law-enforcement officer to use certain equipment to determine.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB563ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 10103337D-E | |
2010-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB563E | |
2010-01-27 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-22 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103337D |