VA HB56 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage; tipped employees; classification. Prohibits an employer from classifying an individual as a tipped employee if the individual is prohibited by applicable federal or state law or regulation from soliciting tips.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; tipped employees, classification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1145)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1145 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB56ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2020-03-05SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N)
2020-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N)
2020-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 14-N)
2020-01-21HousePrinted as engrossed 20100830D-E
2020-01-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB56E
2020-01-21HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-01-21HouseRead second time
2020-01-20HouseRead first time
2020-01-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (18-Y 4-N)
2019-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2019-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100830D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB56&201+sum+HB56
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB56+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB56E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB56ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1145+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0001+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0025+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0237+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB0056+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1579HB0056+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1583HB0056+HB0056
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1584HB0056+HB0056

Bill Comments

feedback