VA HB56 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Crab scraping; possession of hard crabs; characteristics of scrape. Removes the prohibitions against the possession of hard crabs while having a crab scrape on board a vessel and against the use of a mechanical scrape. The bill also increases the maximum allowed length of the mouth of a crab scrape from four feet to five feet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crab scraping; possession of hard crabs, characteristics of scrape.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #3
2017-12-01HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2017-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100727D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback