VA HB559 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; obsolete reporting requirements. Eliminates the requirement for an annual report assessing the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program and regular reports on the fulfillment of Department of Social Services responsibilities related to faith-based and community initiatives.
Title
Social Services, Department of; eliminates obsolete reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Thursday, February 25, 2016 | |
2016-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/18/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB559ER) |
2016-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101672D-E |
2016-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB559E |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101672D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |