VA HB558 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Enhancement of micro-business participation in local procurement. Allows any locality to enact an ordinance to enhance micro-business participation in local government procurement practices. Such measures may include special designation of local micro-businesses, providing technical support to micro-businesses, setting target goals for micro-business participation in the local procurement process, and other reasonable measures intended to promote micro-business participation in the locality. "Micro-business" is defined as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business with no more than 25 employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Micro-business; enhancement of participation in local procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 92-N) (Y: 4 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0--N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB558ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (92-Y 3-N)
2020-03-04HouseConference report agreed to by House (92-Y 3-N)
2020-03-04 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-28SenateSenators: Lewis, Spruill, Pillion
2020-02-28SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Lindsey, Heretick, Morefield
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-26HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-25SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-25SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 92-N)
2020-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (4-Y 92-N)
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0--N)
2020-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100477D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152965.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB558
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB558+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB558ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0702V0028+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0033+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0516+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0100+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0702HB0558+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0710HB0558+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0730HB0558+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0731HB0558+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1142+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0936HB0558+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1767+HB0558
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1741HB0558+HB0558

Bill Comments

feedback