VA HB555 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Snow removal and ice control services contracts; certain provisions declared void. Declares that certain provisions in a snow removal and ice control services contract related to indemnification and tort liability of a service provider or service receiver shall be void and unenforceable. The bill exempts from these provisions snow removal and ice control services contracts for such services to be performed on county, city, town, or state-owned roadways or property.
Title
Snow removal and ice control services contracts; certain provisions declared void.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101922D |