VA HB555 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Professions and occupations; hair braiding. Clarifies that hair braiding is not a practice included under the definition of "cosmetology."
Title
Professions and occupations; hair braiding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 219 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB555ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB555H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105817D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105817D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101042D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 543 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 549 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2263 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 851 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 402.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 404.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:51 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |