VA HB553 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB553

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Policies against workplace harassment; legislative branch. Requires each legislative branch agency to adopt and implement the Commonwealth Workplace Harassment Policy established by the Department of Human Resource Management. The bill provides that the Policy applies to legislative branch employees, including General Assembly members and members-elect, when undertaking meetings with other state employees, contract employees, applicants for employment, customers, vendors, members of the media, members of the public, volunteers, or lobbyists or when conducting or performing election activities in the scope of official duties. Policies against workplace harassment; legislative branch. Requires each legislative branch agency to adopt and implement the Commonwealth Workplace Harassment Policy established by the Department of Human Resource Management. The bill provides that the Policy applies to legislative branch employees, including General Assembly members and members-elect, when undertaking meetings with other state employees, contract employees, applicants for employment, customers, vendors, members of the media, members of the public, volunteers, or lobbyists or when conducting or performing election activities in the scope of official duties. Under the bill, a victim of alleged workplace harassment will be able to file a complaint against a legislative branch employee, other than a member of the General Assembly, in accordance with the procedures of the Policy or with the Division of Human Rights in the Office of the Attorney General. The Division of Human Rights is authorized to investigate the complaint and use any other powers with regard to the complaint granted to it under law. The bill requires each house of the General Assembly to adopt rules governing procedures and disciplinary sanctions for General Assembly members and members-elect violating policies against workplace harassment. The 2018 Session of the General Assembly enacted legislation requiring full-time legislative branch employees to complete a sexual harassment training course once every two calendar years beginning January 1, 2020. In addition to other differences, this bill broadens the scope of training for legislative branch employees and provides for punitive damages if a party complaining of workplace harassment demonstrates that the defendant engaged in a discriminatory practice with malice or reckless indifference. The bill contains a reenactment clause and has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workplace harassment; policies for legislative branch.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Rules (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Rules
2020-02-28SenateContinued to 2021 in Rules (12-Y 1-N)
2020-02-28SenateCommittee amendments
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20101894D-E
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB553E
2020-02-10HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101894D

Same As/Similar To

HB553 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Continued to 2021 in Rules (12-Y 1-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback