VA HB553 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections for certain offices; ranked choice voting. Provides that members of the United States Senate, United States House of Representatives, and General Assembly and the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General shall be elected by ranked choice voting, which the bill describes as the method of casting and tabulating votes in which (i) voters rank candidates in order of preference, (ii) tabulation proceeds in sequential rounds in which last-place candidates are defeated, and (iii) the candidate with the most votes in the final round is elected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections for certain offices; ranked choice voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2018-02-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-09HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 1-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100130D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242673(n/a)See Bill Text
242673.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback