VA HB55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Worker cooperatives. Establishes worker cooperatives as a category of cooperative associations. A worker cooperative is a stock corporation that has elected to be governed by provisions established by this measure, which include (i) conducting its business primarily for the mutual benefit of its members, (ii) allowing only current and retired employees to be members, (iii) limiting voting rights to current employees, (iv) providing that each employee is entitled to one vote, (v) prohibiting any person from owning more than one membership share, (vi) requiring at least two-thirds of employees to own membership shares, and (vii) requiring that net earnings be paid or credited to members in accordance with the ratio that each member's amount of work performed during a period bears to the total amount of work performed by all members during that period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Worker cooperatives; establishes as a category of cooperative associations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 31-N) (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (25-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB55ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (61-Y 31-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (61-Y 31-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendment (25-Y 14-N 1-A)
2020-03-05SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with amendment (28-Y 12-N)
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-03-05SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-03-05SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (62-Y 36-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (62-Y 36-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (10-Y 8-N)
2019-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2019-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100832D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
131301(n/a)See Bill Text
131307(n/a)See Bill Text
131308(n/a)See Bill Text
131346(n/a)See Bill Text
131355(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB55
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB55+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB55ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0673+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0107+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0330+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0234+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB0055+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1578HB0055+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1581HB0055+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1582HB0055+HB0055
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1950+HB0055

Bill Comments 750

feedback