VA HB545 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care licensure; forfeiture of eligibility for religious exemption. Requires child day centers seeking exemption from licensure as a religious institution to file with the Commissioner of Social Services, prior to beginning operation and annually thereafter, documentary evidence that the individual seeking to operate the child day center is not currently ineligible to operate another child welfare agency due to a suspension or revocation of his license or license exemption for reasons involving child safety or any criminal conviction, including fraud, related to such child welfare agency.
Title
Child care licensure; forfeiture of eligibility for religious exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2018 | |
2018-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/12/18 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB545ER) |
2018-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101054D |