VA HB543 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Board of Local and Regional Jails; powers and duties; attorney visitation of clients. Requires the State Board of Local and Regional Jails to develop and establish minimum standards for ensuring that attorneys have sufficient opportunities to have confidential visits with their clients who are held in local, regional, and community correctional facilities, which, considering facility schedules, space, personnel constraints, and inmate disciplinary status, shall include some opportunity for visitation of clients on the weekends and after 5:00 p.m.
Title
Correctional facilities, local, regional, and community; attorney visitation of clients.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100033D |