VA HB542 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Regional water resource planning; State Water Control Board regulations. Directs the State Water Control Board to estimate the risk that each locality and region in the Commonwealth will experience water supply shortfalls, to encourage the development of cross-jurisdictional water supply projects, and to adopt regulations designating regional planning areas based primarily on river basin. Each locality in a particular regional planning area shall participate in cross-jurisdictional, coordinated water resource planning, and all localities in each area shall together develop and submit a single regional water supply plan. The bill directs the Department of Environmental Quality to facilitate the creation of the regional water plans by ensuring sufficient coordination among localities, providing planning and other assistance, and ensuring that each regional plan identifies risks and proposes strategies in response. The bill directs that the Board and the Department prioritize the allocation of funds to localities that sufficiently participate in regional planning. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional water resource planning; State Water Control Board regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N)
2020-02-07HousePrinted as engrossed 20102257D-E
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB542E
2020-02-07HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendment agreed to
2020-02-07HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources amendments agreed to
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-07HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 7-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102257D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.36(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.38(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.38:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback