VA HB542 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dual enrollment agreements; scope. Requires each agreement for postsecondary degree attainment between a local school board and a comprehensive community college to include a process by which high school students who reside in a school division that is governed by a school board that is not a party to such agreement may apply for enrollment in the dual enrollment courses offered pursuant to such agreement.
Title
Dual enrollment agreements; scope.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101046D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |