VA HB541 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Alternative treatment options for certain veterans; report. Directs the Department of Veterans Services to consider the efficacy of alternative treatments available for the treatment of traumatic brain injury and posttraumatic stress disorder and report its findings and conclusions to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health. The bill defines "alternative treatment" as a therapeutic service that (i) is not part of the standard of medical care established by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs for treating traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder but has been shown by at least one scientific or medical peer-reviewed study to have some positive effect on traumatic brain injury or posttraumatic stress disorder and (ii) is provided at the direction and under the supervision of an individual licensed by the Board of Medicine, Nursing, Counseling, Psychology, or Social Work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans, certain; alternative treatment options.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-03-01SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18100200D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB541E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-01HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100200D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222001.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback