VA HB538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment insurance tax reports and payments; filing. Directs the Department of Taxation and the Virginia Employment Commission to consider the feasibility of permitting taxpayers to submit tax reports and payments electronically for both the Virginia Employment Commission and the Department of Taxation using a single sign-on. The Department and the Commission shall also consider the feasibility, merits, and costs of developing and implementing an identity management system or retaining a contractor to do so.
Title
Taxpayers; TAX and VEC to consider feasibility of filing tax reports and payments electronically.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0344) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 344 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB538ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB538H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106563D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106563D-H1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100135D |