VA HB534 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Local disposable plastic bag tax. Authorizes any county or city, beginning no earlier than January 1, 2021, to impose a tax of five cents per bag on disposable plastic bags provided to consumers by certain retailers, with certain bags being exempt from the tax. The bill allows every retailer that collects the tax to retain a portion of the five-cent tax and provides that the revenue accruing to the county or city shall be used for certain purposes, including environmental cleanup and the provision of reusable bags. The measure authorizes the Tax Commissioner to administer the tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposable plastic bags; local tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N 1-A) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 93-N) (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB534ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 47-N 1-A)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 47-N 1-A)
2020-03-05HousePassed by temporarily
2020-03-05HouseConference substitute printed 20109450D-H2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Ebbin, McClellan, Vogel
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Carr, Lopez, Ware
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108914D-S1 (0-Y 93-N)
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB534S1
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108914D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108914D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (52-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HousePassed House (52-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2020-02-11HouseRequires 51 affirmative votes for passage
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (50-Y 49-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and defeated by House (50-Y 49-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB534H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107686D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107686D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseReferred from Finance by voice vote
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101570D

Same As/Similar To

SB11 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
SB11 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813835(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB534&201+sum+HB534
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB534+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB534H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB534S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB534H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB534ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0103V0034+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0159+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0893+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0785+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0404+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0534+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1065HB0534+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1414+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1120HB0534+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1908+HB0534
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1740HB0534+HB0534

Bill Comments

feedback