VA HB533 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources: Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Expanded polystyrene food service containers; prohibition; civil penalty. Prohibits the dispensing by a food vendor of prepared food to a customer in a single-use expanded polystyrene food service container, as defined in the bill. The bill requires certain chain restaurants to stop using such containers by July 1, 2023, and sets the date for compliance by all food vendors as July 1, 2025. The bill exempts certain institutions, including correctional facilities and public schools, from the definition of "food vendor" and provides a process by which a locality may grant consecutive one-year exemptions to individual food vendors on the basis of undue economic hardship. The bill provides a civil penalty of $50 for each day of violation, to be collected in a civil action brought by the Attorney General or the relevant locality. The penalties collected are to be deposited in the Litter Control and Recycling Fund or to the treasury of the relevant locality, as appropriate. Finally, the bill directs the Department of Environmental Quality to post to its website information on compliance and the filing of complaints.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded polystyrene food service containers; prohibition on dispensing, civil penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100170D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011414(n/a)See Bill Text
1011422.01(n/a)See Bill Text
1011424.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback