VA HB530 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Commission on Intergovernmental Cooperation. Provides for the Speaker of the House of Delegates to make appointments of members of the House of Delegates to serve on intergovernmental boards, committees, and commissions. Currently, appointments to intergovernmental boards, committees, and commissions of (i) state and local government officials, excluding General Assembly members, are made by the Virginia Commission on Intergovernmental Cooperation; (ii) members of the Senate are made by the Commission on Interstate Cooperation of the Senate, subject to the approval of the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Rules; and (iii) members of the House of Delegates are made by the Commission on Interstate Cooperation of the House of Delegates, subject to the approval of the Speaker of the House of Delegates.
Title
Intergovernmental Cooperation, Virginia Commission on; appointment of House of Delegates members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 525 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB530ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-19 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102324D |