VA HB530 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Historic Route 1." Designates U.S. Route 1 in Virginia as "Historic Route 1."
Title
Route 1; designating as Historic Route 1 in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enacted, Chapter 109 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB530ER2) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB530ER) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-18 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-01-22 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101095D |