VA HB53 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB53ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Persons acquitted by reason of insanity; evaluation. Provides that a court may authorize a person acquitted of a crime by reason of insanity to be evaluated for commitment or release with or without conditions on an outpatient basis. The bill provides that if a court authorizes an outpatient evaluation, the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services shall determine whether to conduct the evaluation on an outpatient basis or to confine the person to a hospital for the purpose of such evaluation. The bill also provides that the evaluation shall be conducted in a hospital if the court does not authorize an outpatient evaluation. Under current law, the person acquitted must be confined to a hospital for the purpose of such evaluation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Persons acquitted by reason of insanity; evaluation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB53ER)
2018-02-16HouseEnrolled
2018-02-14SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-02-14SenateRead third time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB53H1
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105885D-H1
2018-02-01HouseRead second time
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105885D-H1
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100446D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192182.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback