VA HB53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile offenders; sentence modification. Provides a mechanism for a person convicted of a nonhomicide offense committed on or after January 1, 1995, while the person was a juvenile, and who is sentenced to life or a term of confinement that would be completed after his 60th birthday, to petition for a modification of sentence at age 35 or after serving 20 years of the sentence, whichever occurs later.
Title
Juvenile offenders; sentence modification procedure.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100275D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB53 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB53+hil |