VA HB53 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tangible personal property tax relief. Requires that beginning with tax year 2013 the reimbursement paid by the Commonwealth to localities for providing tangible personal property tax relief would be apportioned approximately in an equal dollar amount among all vehicles in the county, city, or town qualifying for the tax relief.
Title
Tangible personal property; tax relief for qualifying vehicles.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | House: Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2011-12-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-19 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100391D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Motor Vehicles
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Motor Vehicles
Personal Property and Personal Property Tax
Taxation
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB53 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB53+hil |