VA HB527 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American cemeteries and graves; Portsmouth. Adds the Mt. Calvary Cemetery in the City of Portsmouth, with 266 eligible gravesites, to the list of historical African American cemeteries for which qualifying charitable organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. This bill is identical to SB 198.
Title
Historical African American cemeteries and graves; adds Mt. Calvary Cemetery in City of Portsmouth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 433 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB527ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102415D |