VA HB523 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects; membership. Adds two nonlegislative citizen members to the Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects and provides that one of those members be present to constitute a quorum. The bill also removes the provision requiring that the Council of Certified Virginia Interior Designers submit nominations for interior design members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, etc., Board for; membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 824 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB523ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB523ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 18101705D-E
2018-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB523E
2018-02-02HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-02HouseRead second time
2018-02-01HouseRead first time
2018-01-30HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101705D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541403(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB523
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB523+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB523E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB523ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB523ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0824+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0010+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0030+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0312+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0165+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB0523+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB0523+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1640+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0523+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0523+HB0523
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0523+HB0523

Bill Comments

feedback