VA HB522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Safe reporting of criminal sexual assault. Establishes an affirmative defense to prosecution of an individual for (i) simple possession of a controlled substance, marijuana, or controlled paraphernalia; (ii) intoxication in public; or (iii) the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol if such individual reports to a law-enforcement officer that he was the victim of or witness to a criminal sexual assault that occurred concurrently with the conduct listed in clause (i), (ii), or (iii) if the evidence for the charge was obtained as a result of the individual reporting the criminal sexual assault. The bill provides that no individual may assert this affirmative defense if the emergency medical attention sought or obtained was during the execution of a search warrant or during the conduct of a lawful search or a lawful arrest. The bill provides further that no disciplinary action, including expulsion, shall be taken against a student for any conduct involving alcohol, marijuana, a controlled substance, or an imitation controlled substance on a school bus, school property, or at a school-sponsored activity if, concurrent to such conduct, the student was a victim of or witness to a criminal sexual assault.
Title
Criminal sexual assault; establishes safe reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101280D |