VA HB520 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB520H1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Environmental Quality; tree planting as land cover type, best management practice; stakeholder group. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) to convene a stakeholder advisory group for the purpose of studying the planting or preservation of trees as a land cover type and as a stormwater best management practice (BMP). The bill provides that the stakeholder group shall be composed of development and construction industry representatives, environmental technical experts, local government representatives, and others and that technical assistance shall be provided to DEQ by the Department of Forestry and the Department of Conservation and Recreation. The bill directs DEQ to report the findings of the stakeholder group by November 1, 2020, and to include a recommendation as to whether the planting or preservation of trees shall be deemed a creditable land cover type or BMP and, if so, how much credit shall be given for its optional use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trees; DEQ to convene advisory to study planting or preservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB520H1
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106166D-H1
2020-01-27HouseRead second time
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106166D-H1
2020-01-22HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101520D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback