VA HB517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary commitment of a juvenile; notification of parents. Provides that a petition for the involuntary commitment of a minor shall not be dismissed for failure to immediately serve both parents with a copy of the petition and notice of the hearing if one parent is present at the hearing and the judge determines that a reasonable effort was made to notify the other parent.
Title
Involuntary commitment of a juvenile; notification of parents.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102875D |