VA HB516 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Flood resiliency and protection. Implements recommendations from the first Virginia Coastal Resilience Master Plan. The bill provides guidelines for the development of a Virginia Flood Protection Master Plan for the Commonwealth and requires that the Coastal Resilience Master Plan be updated by December 31, 2022, and every five years thereafter. The bill establishes the Virginia Coastal Resilience Technical Advisory Committee to assist with the updates and requires the development of a community outreach and engagement plan to ensure meaningful involvement by affected and vulnerable community residents. The bill also requires that the Chief Resilience Officer report every two years, beginning July 1, 2023, on the status of flood resilience in the Commonwealth.
Title
Flood resiliency & protection; implements recom. from first Va. Coastal Resilience Master Plan.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0494) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 494 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103091D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB516E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103091D |
Same As/Similar To
SB551 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
SB551 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
SB551 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Conservation
Floods and Flood Control
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Conservation
Floods and Flood Control
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 659 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 222.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |