VA HB516 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; diploma requirements; dual enrollment and work-based learning options. Requires the Board of Education to include in its graduation requirements the options for students to complete a dual enrollment course or high-quality work-based learning experience.
Title
High school graduation; standard diploma requirements, etc.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Joseph McNamara [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 55 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-24 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB516H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106138D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Incorporates HB112 (McNamara) |
2020-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106138D-H1 |
2020-01-20 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103062D |
Same As/Similar To
HB112 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Education
SB112 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
SB112 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)