VA HB515 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension and expulsion of students; parental notification. Requires the school principal or his administrative designee to exercise reasonable efforts to notify the parents of any student who violates a school board policy or the compulsory school attendance requirements when such violation could result in the student's suspension, long-term suspension, or expulsion or the filing of a court petition.
Title
Students; reasonable efforts to notify parents when violation could result in long-term suspension.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] |
Del. Rick Morris [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB515H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104685D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104685D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102706D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 274.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |