VA HB5148 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor's recommendation received by House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Corrections; earned sentence credits. Establishes a four-level classification system for the awarding and calculation of earned sentence credits. The bill also specifies certain crimes that are subject to the maximum 4.5 earned sentence credits for each 30 days served that is permitted under current law. The bill provides that the Department of Corrections shall convene in due course a work group to study the impact of the sentence credit amendments set forth in the act. The bill directs the work group to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2021, the membership of the work group and the work group's plan for conducting such study, including any data and information upon which the work group will rely in conducting such study, and to report its finding and conclusions to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022. The remainder of the bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022, and requires the calculation of earned sentence credits to apply retroactively to the entire sentence of any inmate who is confined in a state correctional facility and participating in the earned sentence credit system on January 1, 2022. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned sentence credits; 4.5 credits may be earned for each 30 days served on certain sentences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 93-N) (Y: 0 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (54-Y 41-N) (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5148ER)
2020-10-16HouseEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 42-N)
2020-10-13HouseConference substitute printed 20201338D-H4
2020-10-13 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Boysko, Surovell, Cosgrove
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Scott, Herring, Miyares
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-10-07SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-10-07SenateSenate insisted on substitute (21-Y 15-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 93-N)
2020-10-02HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 93-N)
2020-10-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-10-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-10-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5148S1
2020-10-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to
2020-10-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-10-01SenateRead third time
2020-10-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N)
2020-09-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201211D-S1
2020-09-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-09-16SenateRereferred from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)
2020-09-15SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage #2 (54-Y 41-N)
2020-09-10HousePassed House (54-Y 41-N)
2020-09-10HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 43-N)
2020-09-10HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 43-N)
2020-09-09HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB5148H3
2020-09-09HouseSubstitute by Delegate Scott agreed to 20201159D-H3
2020-09-09HouseAppropriations Committee substitute rejected 20201142D-H2
2020-09-09HouseCourts of Justice Committee substitute rejected 20201113D-H1
2020-09-09HouseRead second time
2020-09-09HouseFloor substitute printed 20201159D-H3 (Scott)
2020-09-08HouseRead first time
2020-09-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201142D-H2
2020-09-04HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201113D-H1
2020-09-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N)
2020-09-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-01HousePresented and ordered printed 20201069D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531202.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5148&202+sum+HB5148
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148H4+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5148ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0026+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0022+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0080+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0078+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0060+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S09V0010+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0051+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0151HB5148+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0190HB5148+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0122+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0240HB5148+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0280HB5148+HB5148
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0191+HB5148

Bill Comments

feedback