VA HB514 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; training requirement for barbers and cosmetologists. Prohibits the Board for Barbers and Cosmetology from requiring completion of more than 1,000 hours of training in the field for which an applicant for a license to practice barbering or cosmetology seeks licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbers and cosmetologists; training requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in General Laws
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
2020-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102304D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback