VA HB5116 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Paid quarantine leave. Requires public and private employers to provide eligible employees paid quarantine leave. The bill provides that such paid quarantine leave is available for immediate use by the employee, regardless of how long the employee has been employed by the employer. The bill provides that such paid quarantine leave may be used for (i) an eligible employee's illness or health condition related to the COVID-19 virus; an eligible employee's need for medical diagnosis, care, or treatment of an illness or health condition related to the COVID-19 virus; or an eligible employee's need for preventive medical care related to the COVID-19 virus; (ii) care of a family member with an illness or health condition related to the COVID-19 virus; care of a family member who needs medical diagnosis, care, or treatment of a mental or physical illness or health condition related to the COVID-19 virus; or care of a family member who needs preventive medical care related to the COVID-19 virus; or (iii) or care for oneself or a family member when it has been determined by the health authorities having jurisdiction or by a health care provider that the eligible employee's or family member's presence in the community may jeopardize the health of others because of his exposure to the COVID-19 virus, whether or not the eligible employee or family member has actually contracted COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public and private employers; required to provide eligible employees paid quarantine leave, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
2020-09-15SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-09-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-09-10HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-09-10HousePassed by until after Resolutions Regular Calendar
2020-09-09HousePrinted as engrossed 20201111D-EH1
2020-09-09HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5116EH1
2020-09-09HousePending question ordered
2020-09-09HouseAmendments by Delegate Guzman agreed to
2020-09-09HouseAppropriations Committee substitute agreed to 20201111D-H1
2020-09-09HouseLabor and Commerce Committee amendment rejected
2020-09-09HouseRead second time
2020-09-08HousePassed by for the day
2020-09-04HouseRead first time
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201111D-H1
2020-09-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-24HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-08-24HousePresented and ordered printed 20200901D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40133.3(n/a)See Bill Text
40133.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback