VA HB5113 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain school boards; student meals; participation in the Community Eligibility Provision. Requires each school board that governs a local school division that contains any public elementary or secondary school that is eligible to participate in the Community Eligibility Provision (CEP) administered by the U.S. Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service (FNS) to apply to FNS to participate in CEP for each such school. The bill provides that the Superintendent for Public Instruction shall issue a waiver to this requirement upon determination that participation in CEP is not financially viable for a school or group of schools. The Department of Education shall develop a process and criteria for evaluating such waiver requests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards, certain; student meals, participation in the Community Eligibility Provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - House - House: VOTE: (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
2020-10-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 2 ((effective 3/1/21)
2020-10-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020
2020-10-02SenateSigned by President
2020-10-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5113ER)
2020-10-02HouseEnrolled
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25SenateRead third time
2020-09-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2020-09-22SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-08HouseVOTE: (96-Y 0-N)
2020-09-08HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
2020-09-04HousePrinted as engrossed 20200612D-E
2020-09-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5113E
2020-09-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-04HouseRead second time
2020-09-03HousePassed by for the day
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-08-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-21HousePresented and ordered printed 20200612D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5113
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5113+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5113E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5113ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0002+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0014+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0068+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S04V0029+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0139HB5113+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0144HB5113+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0145HB5113+HB5113
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0146HB5113+HB5113

Bill Comments 750

feedback