VA HB5112 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement officer; duty to render aid; duty to report wrongdoing by another law-enforcement officer; penalty. Requires any law-enforcement officer on duty who witnesses another person suffering from a serious bodily injury or a life-threatening condition to render aid and makes it a duty to report acts of wrongdoing committed by another law-enforcement officer. Any law-enforcement officer who fails to render such aid or report such acts of abuse, fraud, misconduct, or wrongdoing committed by another law-enforcement officer shall be subject to disciplinary action, including dismissal, demotion, suspension, or transfer of the law-enforcement officer. The bill also penalizes as a Class 1 misdemeanor the failure of any law-enforcement officer, who has actual knowledge of the commission on duty of a criminal offense by another law-enforcement officer, to report such wrongdoing, defined in the bill. The bill also amends the definition of "bias-based profiling" to include sexual orientation and gender identity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officer; duty to render aid, duty to report wrongdoing by another officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N)
2020-09-03HousePrinted as engrossed 20200610D-E
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB5112E
2020-09-03HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N)
2020-08-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-21HousePresented and ordered printed 20200610D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521704.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521704.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback