VA HB51 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Evidentiary hearings in the Supreme Court of Virginia; Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission. Clarifies that the hearings allowed under the Constitution of Virginia related to complaints filed by the Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission are to be evidentiary hearings and that both the Commission and the judge who is the subject of the complaint are entitled to present evidence and argument during such hearings subject to any scheduling orders issued by the Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Evidentiary hearings in the Supreme Court of Virginia; Judicial Inquiry and Review Commission.


Roll Calls

2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-13HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 1-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-12-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-12-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101124D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171906(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments