VA HB5098 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Hate crime; falsely summoning or giving false reports to law-enforcement officials; penalty. Increases the penalty for falsely summoning or giving false reports to law-enforcement officials from a Class 1 misdemeanor to a Class 6 felony when a person intentionally gives a false report as to the commission of any crime to any law-enforcement official, causes another to give a false report to any law-enforcement official, or calls or summons any law-enforcement official against another person because of his race, religious conviction, gender, disability, gender identity, sexual orientation, color, or national origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate crimes; falsely summoning or giving false reports to law-enforcement officials, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-24SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-09-16SenateReported from Judiciary (7-Y 2-N)
2020-09-09SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-09-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-04HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-04HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2020-09-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB5098H1
2020-09-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201045D-H1
2020-09-03HouseRead second time
2020-09-02HouseRead first time
2020-08-31HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-08-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-08-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201045D-H1
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2020-08-20HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-20HousePresented and ordered printed 20200320D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182461(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback