VA HB5090 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; law-enforcement criminal incident information; criminal investigative files. Adds criminal investigative files, defined in the bill, to the types of law-enforcement and criminal records required to be released in accordance with the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act. Under current law, the release of criminal investigative files is discretionary. The bill also allows a law-enforcement agency or attorney for the Commonwealth to petition a court of record for permission not to release criminal incident information that would otherwise be subject to release, if the release of such information is likely to jeopardize an ongoing investigation or cause certain other harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; law-enforcement criminal incident information, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 37-N) (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18SenatePassed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (14-Y 0-N)
2020-09-15SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-09-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-09-10HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 37-N)
2020-09-10HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 37-N)
2020-09-09HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB5090H3
2020-09-09HouseSubstitute by Delegate Hurst agreed to 20201160D-H3
2020-09-09HouseSubstitute by Delegate Hurst rejected 20201145D-H2
2020-09-09HouseCourts of Justice Committee amendments ruled out of order
2020-09-09HouseDelegate Campbell's amendments withdrawn
2020-09-09HouseGeneral Laws Committee substitute rejected 20200992D-H1
2020-09-09HouseRead second time
2020-09-09HouseFloor substitute printed 20201160D-H3 (Hurst)
2020-09-09HouseFloor substitute printed 20201145D-H2 (Hurst)
2020-09-08HouseRead first time
2020-09-04HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-03HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-03HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2020-08-28HouseRead first time
2020-08-26HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 7-N)
2020-08-24HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-08-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 20200992D-H1
2020-08-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-08-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-08-19HousePresented and ordered printed 20200705D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+HB5090&202+sum+HB5090
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5090+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5090H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5090H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+HB5090H3+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0005+HB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0010+HB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0024+HB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0021+HB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0079+HB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S12V0022+HB5090

Bill Comments

feedback